This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2020 at 10:29:50 (UTC).

OSBORNE, ALISA VS ALVAREZ, CHRISTIN

Case Summary

On 12/24/2019 OSBORNE, ALISA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ALVAREZ, CHRISTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMERIAN, MICHAEL R, MORDETZKY, MARILYN, MOSS, BRUCE and RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1965

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMERIAN, MICHAEL R

MORDETZKY, MARILYN

MOSS, BRUCE

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OSBORNE ALISA

Respondent

ALVAREZ CHRISTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

THOMAS ANDREW JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice - of Entry of Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by court; Notice of Settlement on Remaining Issue; Request by Moving Party and Respondent that the March 10, 2020 hearing be Vacated

2/24/2020: Notice - of Entry of Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by court; Notice of Settlement on Remaining Issue; Request by Moving Party and Respondent that the March 10, 2020 hearing be Vacated

Minute Order

2/10/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/7/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/7/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

1/17/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

1/17/2020: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/17/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - Mail

1/17/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Minute Order

1/17/2020: Minute Order

Response - Civil Harassment

1/15/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

Proof of Service - CH-109, CH-110, CH-100

1/8/2020: Proof of Service - CH-109, CH-110, CH-100

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

12/24/2019: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Petition - Civil Harassment

12/24/2019: Petition - Civil Harassment

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

12/24/2019: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

12/24/2019: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Harassment

12/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

12/24/2019: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by court; Notice of Settlement on Remaining Issue; Request by Moving Party and Respondent that the March 10, 2020 hearing be Vacated ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Moss, Bruce, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Transferred to Dept. 2 for Judicial Review per CCP 4251(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Amerian, Michael R, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Transfer - for all Purpose-Non Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-109, CH-110, CH-100 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Civil Harassment )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ANDREW J.