This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 04:17:25 (UTC).

ORTWIN FREYERMUTH VS STEVEN KAY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 ORTWIN FREYERMUTH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STEVEN KAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7450

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREYERMUTH ORTWIN

Defendants

KAY STEVEN

SINGER ADAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEGITTINO TRICIA L

SAMET MATTHEW CODY

Defendant Attorneys

CLARK PERI

THOMPSON DENISE

BABAIAN PIERRO H.

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

 

Court Documents

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/3/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/3/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/2/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

7/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ADAM SINGER'S REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

7/2/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ADAM SINGER'S REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/8/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

6/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/23/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF DENISE THOMPSON PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 AND 435.5

5/24/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF DENISE THOMPSON PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 AND 435.5

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF T. LEGITTINO ISO OBJECTION TO DECL OF D. THOMPSON PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 AND 435.5

5/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF T. LEGITTINO ISO OBJECTION TO DECL OF D. THOMPSON PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 AND 435.5

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/12/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STRIKING PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STRIKING PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

5/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Adam Singer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Steven Kay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Ortwin Freyermuth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Striking Portions of Complaint); Filed by Adam Singer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Adam Singer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ortwin Freyermuth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ortwin Freyermuth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ortwin Freyermuth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ortwin Freyermuth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ortwin Freyermuth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ortwin Freyermuth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BABAIAN PIERRO H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON DENISE ESQ.