Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 16:50:13 (UTC).

URIARTE ORTIZ, JOSE ERNESTO VS TORRES, ERICA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 URIARTE ORTIZ, JOSE ERNESTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TORRES, ERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0777

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ORTIZ JOSE ERNESTO URIARTE

URIARTE ORTIZ JOSE ERNESTO

Respondent

TORRES ERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

4/7/2021: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected.

4/7/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected.

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected.

4/7/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected.

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/7/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

3/18/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/18/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution, Child Custody and Visitation Attachment & UCCJEA Declaration

3/18/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution, Child Custody and Visitation Attachment & UCCJEA Declaration

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/22/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service of Summons - Petition - FL100;

2/23/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Petition - FL100;

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/21/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/21/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

1/21/2021: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/21/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/21/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/27/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

1/27/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response to Dissolution, Child Custody and Visitation Attachment & UCCJEA Declaration ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Petition - FL100; ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS