Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 14:47:31 (UTC).

ORLANDO GARCIA VS TRCF REDONDO TOD, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 ORLANDO GARCIA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TRCF REDONDO TOD, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA ORLANDO

Defendant

TRCF REDONDO TOD LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Status Conference and Order

2/19/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

2/19/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • Hearing06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Hearing06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Removal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRCF REDONDO TOD LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE