This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 23:13:29 (UTC).

ORLANDO GARCIA VS LANDWIN HOSPITALITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 ORLANDO GARCIA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LANDWIN HOSPITALITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0096

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA ORLANDO

Defendant

LANDWIN HOSPITALITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

Defendant Attorneys

YEE STEVEN R

VILLAMOR MYRA B

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

6/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

6/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/13/2021

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/13/2021

Notice of Ruling

6/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Answer

6/4/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Case Management Statement

6/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

5/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LANDWIN HOSPITALITY, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/20/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT LANDWIN HOSPITALITY, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

5/17/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

3/4/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Landwin Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Landwin Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by Landwin Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21GDCV00096    Hearing Date: May 28, 2021    Dept: E

MOTION TO STRIKE

[CCP § 436]

Date: 5/21/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Orlando Garcia v. Landwin Hospitality, LLC (21GDCV00096)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Landwin Hospitality, LLC’s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff’s Complaint is DENIED.

Under CCP § 436, the Court has discretion to strike irrelevant, false, or improper matter in a pleading, or parts of a pleading that do not conform with the laws of California. (CCP § 436 [“The court may, upon a motion made pursuant to Section 435, or at any time in its discretion, and upon terms it deems proper . . . .”].) Here, the Court in its discretion declines to strike the paragraphs specified in the notice of motion. Paragraphs 8 through 11 of the Complaint provide background information and context for plaintiff’s allegations of disability discrimination based on defendant’s purported failure to provide accessibility information for its hotel rooms.

Ten (10) days to answer.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDWIN HOSPITALITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VILLAMOR MYRA B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEE STEVEN R. ESQ.