This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 15:24:27 (UTC).

ORLANDO GARCIA VS BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 ORLANDO GARCIA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0107

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA ORLANDO

Defendant

BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

BALLISTER RAYMOND GEORGE JR

Defendant Attorney

STILLMAN PHILIP HARRIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/1/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F updated: Result Date to 06/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/03/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Bell Gardens Hospitality, LLC, a California Limited Liability (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less