This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 00:44:04 (UTC).

ORIT GABAY, ET AL. VS FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 ORIT GABAY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6342

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GABAY ORIT

GABAY MOSHE

Defendant

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA RECIPROCAL OR INTER-INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN GLENN

Defendant Attorney

SCHER GREGORY B.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLENN ROSEN IN RESPONSE TO OSC

7/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLENN ROSEN IN RESPONSE TO OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE PU...)

7/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE PU...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/15/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT ...)

2/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

2/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/31/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

1/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/13/2019: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/10/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/10/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Orit Gabay (Plaintiff); Moshe Gabay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 128.5, 177.5, 581, 583 (cf 3/19/20)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute pu...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Glenn Rosen in Response to OSC); Filed by Moshe Gabay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 128.5, 177.5, 581, 583 (cf 3/19/20)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 128.5, 177.5, 581, 583 (cf 3/19/20)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice ( of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by Fire Insurance Exchange, a California Reciprocal or Inter-Insurance Exchange (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Fire Insurance Exchange, a California Reciprocal or Inter-Insurance Exchange (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Fire Insurance Exchange, a California Reciprocal or Inter-Insurance Exchange (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Moshe Gabay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fire Insurance Exchange, a California Reciprocal or Inter-Insurance Exchange (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Orit Gabay (Plaintiff); Moshe Gabay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Orit Gabay (Plaintiff); Moshe Gabay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Orit Gabay (Plaintiff); Moshe Gabay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHER GREGORY B. ESQ.