This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 02:36:40 (UTC).

ORI LAHAV, ET AL. VS CARLA KRALOVIC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 ORI LAHAV filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARLA KRALOVIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART, UPINDER S. KALRA and JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1056

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

UPINDER S. KALRA

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALDAMA MELISSA

LAHAV ORI

Defendants

BROOM PATTIE

KRALOVIC CARLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLENER JOSEPH

KELLENER JOSEPH W.

Defendant Attorney

GRIBIN SANCHEZ MARCY LYNN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/23/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/31/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer

2/16/2022: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 03/03/2022

3/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 03/03/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

3/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

2/16/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • Hearing08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to FAC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ori Lahav (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carla Kralovic (Defendant); Pattie Broom (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Upinder S. Kalra, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 03/03/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pattie Broom (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Carla Kralovic (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Ori Lahav (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ori Lahav (Plaintiff); Melissa Aldama (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ori Lahav (Plaintiff); Melissa Aldama (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ori Lahav (Plaintiff); Melissa Aldama (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less