This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 14:46:06 (UTC).

ORETHEA FLOWERS VS RONALD REAGAN UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 ORETHEA FLOWERS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RONALD REAGAN UCLA MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4410

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLOWERS ORETHEA

Defendants

O?BRYANT NAIDA

RONALD REAGAN UCLA MEDICAL CENTER

O'BRYANT NAIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TODD KYLE ESQ.

LIM PRESTON H ESQ.

LIM PRESTON H.

TODD KYLE

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS JR. REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

5/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/3/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

5/18/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/18/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILUR...)

4/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILUR...)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Answer

3/30/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/7/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

2/8/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/4/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/4/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Orethea Flowers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Regents of the University of California Erroneously Sued As Ronald Reagan UCLA Medical Center (Defendant); Naida O'Bryant (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Orethea Flowers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Naida O'Bryant (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to defendant, Nadia O'Bryant) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Orethea Flowers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Orethea Flowers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Orethea Flowers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Orethea Flowers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RONALD REAGAN UCLA MEDICAL CENTER 6ICU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reginald Roberts, Jr