This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 15:59:16 (UTC).

ORDONEZ, CRISTAL VS ORDONEZ, ROMAN

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 ORDONEZ, CRISTAL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ORDONEZ, ROMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1187

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORDONEZ CRISTAL

Respondent

ORDONEZ ROMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Respondent Attorney

INGLIS CHRISTINE REYNOLDS

 

Court Documents

FCS-Mediation Memo

7/13/2022: FCS-Mediation Memo

Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO

7/18/2022: Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - (New date: 8/31/22 830AM F50)

7/18/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - (New date: 8/31/22 830AM F50)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

7/18/2022: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

7/20/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

7/20/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

7/21/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/21/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/27/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/27/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

6/27/2022: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

6/27/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

Notice - Case Assignment

6/27/2022: Notice - Case Assignment

Summons

6/27/2022: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/27/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

6/27/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

6/27/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

6/27/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • Hearing08/31/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department F50 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) ((New date: 8/31/22 830AM F50) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer INGLIS CHRISTINE REYNOLDS