Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2019 at 21:20:56 (UTC).

ONNIE 535 BRAND LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 ONNIE 535 BRAND LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1353

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONNI 535 BRAND LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FISHER ALEXANDER

FISHER ALEXANDER JORDAN

Defendant Attorney

TAMER STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE - COMMERCIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

11/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE - COMMERCIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

11/25/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/12/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/23/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Status Conference and Order

10/23/2019: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC.)

10/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC.)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 10:00 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 10:00 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference - Commercial Unlawful Detainer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to demurrer); Filed by Onni 535 Brand Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by ERG Home Health Provider Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Onni 535 Brand Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ERG Home Health Provider Inc.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Onni 535 Brand Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Onni 535 Brand Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Onni 535 Brand Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMER STEVEN