This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 04:16:49 (UTC).

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ARIEL FEDERICO SONG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ARIEL FEDERICO SONG,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0783

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

Defendants

KOSOIAN KHACHIK

SCHWARTZ ANDREW

SCHWARTZ LOPSIE L.

SONG ARIEL FEDERICO

SONG DEBORAH NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOLEFIELD PAMELA J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/29/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ONLY AS TO: ARIEL FEDERICO SONG, AN INDIVIDUAL; AND DEBORAH NANCY SONG, AN INDIVIDUAL.

1/6/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ONLY AS TO: ARIEL FEDERICO SONG, AN INDIVIDUAL; AND DEBORAH NANCY SONG, AN INDIVIDUAL.

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/8/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/9/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • Hearing06/09/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketAddress for Pamela J. Scholefield (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Pamela J. Scholefield (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/09/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2877509 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2877510 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal only as to: Ariel Federico Song, an individual; and Deborah Nancy Song, an individual. Filed by: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ARIEL FEDERICO SONG (Defendant); DEBORAH NANCY SONG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company on 12/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC as to ARIEL FEDERICO SONG and DEBORAH NANCY SONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company on 12/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAddress for Pamela J. Scholefield (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: ARIEL FEDERICO SONG (Defendant); DEBORAH NANCY SONG (Defendant); KHACHIK KOSOIAN (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: ARIEL FEDERICO SONG (Defendant); DEBORAH NANCY SONG (Defendant); KHACHIK KOSOIAN (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: ARIEL FEDERICO SONG (Defendant); DEBORAH NANCY SONG (Defendant); KHACHIK KOSOIAN (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yolanda Orozco in Department 31 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less