This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 05:48:57 (UTC).

ON DECK CAPITAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS MILESTONE TRUCKING INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 ON DECK CAPITAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILESTONE TRUCKING INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0326

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ON DECK CAPITAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

MILESTONE TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MURAT AN INDIVIDUAL IVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELHOUSE CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/20/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

8/20/2021: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/14/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILESTONE TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ON DECK CAPITAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melhouse, Christina