This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 00:10:02 (UTC).

ON DECK CAPITAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS GRIDWORKS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 ON DECK CAPITAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GRIDWORKS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0230

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ON DECK CAPITAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

DUNN AN INDIVIDUAL GREGORY

GRIDWORKS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELHOUSE CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

NOWLAND THOMAS F

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/19/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gridworks Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Gregory Dunn, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by On Deck Capital, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON DECK CAPITAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melhouse, Christina