Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 04:50:56 (UTC).

OMER VAUGHN VS SUNDAY OLESEGUN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 OMER VAUGHN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUNDAY OLESEGUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3647

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAUGHN OMER

Defendants

LOS ANGELES METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

OLESEGUN SUNDAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCUTCHEN CLARK L

Defendant Attorney

HERZOG VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/17/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/17/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

12/3/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2023
  • Hearing11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Hearing05/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Hearing04/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sunday Olesegun (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sunday Olesegun (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Omer Vaughn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Omer Vaughn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Omer Vaughn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCUTCHEN CLARK L