This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:31:22 (UTC).

OMAR LARA VS AECOM ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 OMAR LARA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AECOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS, HOLLY E. KENDIG and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3925

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LARA OMAR

Defendants and Respondents

TRINIDAD LORNA

AECOM

CASTRO ENRIQUE

BUILDLACCD

PACIFICA SERVICES INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100

HILL INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATION

INTEGRATION TECHNOLOGY INCORPORATION

SIERRA SAORI

LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

INTEGRATION TECHNOLOGY INC.

JACOBS ENGINEERING INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

JACOBS ENGINEERING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BOHM LAWRENCE A. ESQ.

BOHM LAWRANCE ALEXANDER ESQ.

MANCUSO BRADLEY J.

ORTIZ BRANDON PHILLIP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

OLIVAREZ MADRUGA LLP

SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

GARRETT SHANNEN T.

BROWN DAMON MICHAEL

SHELBY LAURA WILSON

ANSON LAURA JEAN

SAUNDERS ALLISON VASQUEZ

CROSMAN CHRISTOPHER ADAM

WADA OLIVIA J.

BARBER JOHN LONGYEAR

CROSNER RYAN

 

Court Documents

NON SERVICE REPORT

2/8/2018: NON SERVICE REPORT

NON SERVICE REPORT

2/8/2018: NON SERVICE REPORT

NON SERVICE REPORT

2/8/2018: NON SERVICE REPORT

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. FAILURE TO PREVENT HARASSMENT, DISCRIMINATION, AND RETALIATION 2. DISCRIMINATION 3. HARASSMENT 4. HOSTILE WORK ENVIRONMENT SEXUAL HARASSMEN

3/5/2018: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. FAILURE TO PREVENT HARASSMENT, DISCRIMINATION, AND RETALIATION 2. DISCRIMINATION 3. HARASSMENT 4. HOSTILE WORK ENVIRONMENT SEXUAL HARASSMEN

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/5/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/12/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/12/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANT PACIFICA SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/28/2018: DEFENDANT PACIFICA SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/28/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

3/28/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT PACIFICA SERVICES, INC.'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/6/2018: DEFENDANT PACIFICA SERVICES, INC.'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT AECOM'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF OMAR LARA'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/6/2018: DEFENDANT AECOM'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF OMAR LARA'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT ENRIQUE CASTRO?S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/8/2018: DEFENDANT ENRIQUE CASTRO?S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT INTEGRATION TECHNOLOGY INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AND SIXTH THROUGH EIGHTH CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

5/17/2018: DEFENDANT INTEGRATION TECHNOLOGY INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AND SIXTH THROUGH EIGHTH CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/25/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Ryan H. Crosner) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Ryan H. Crosner) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date; M...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Ryan H. Crosner); Filed by Jacobs Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:35 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference) of 06/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-11-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by OMAR LARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S VERWIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. FAILURE TO PREVENT HARASSMENT, DISCRIMINATION, AND RETALIATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by OMAR LARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACOBS ENGINEERING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICA SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hill International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant