Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 12:46:45 (UTC).

OMAR J. ALVAREZ, ET AL. VS ABM AVIATION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 OMAR J ALVAREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABM AVIATION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4870

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ OMAR J.

Defendant

ABM AVIATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY MARCUS JOSEPH

MAJARIAN SAHAG II

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

4/29/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/3/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770;)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770;) OF 03/12/2021

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770;) OF 03/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

3/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 03/22/2021

3/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 03/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL OF PURSUANT TO CRC 3...)

1/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL OF PURSUANT TO CRC 3...)

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

2/11/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSION CLASS CLAIMS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED PAGA-ONLY COMPLAINT AFTER JANUARY 25, 2021

1/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSION CLASS CLAIMS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED PAGA-ONLY COMPLAINT AFTER JANUARY 25, 2021

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

12/18/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/09/2020

Initial Status Conference Order

12/9/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/20/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • Hearing07/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ABM Aviation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 03/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReDismissal of Pursuant to CRC 3.770) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Omar J. Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Omar J. Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 12/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Omar J. Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Omar J. Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY MARCUS J.