This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2020 at 04:44:22 (UTC).

OLYMFIG26 LLC VS ORIT MESICA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 OLYMFIG26 LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ORIT MESICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC MARMARO and ALAN S. ROSENFIELD. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4366

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC MARMARO

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OLYMFIG26 LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 5

MESICA ORIT

EJ'S BITES AND JINO'S PIZZERIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MELLER ERIC ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KOLBER R. RICHARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

8/15/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

8/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

8/28/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)

11/20/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)

Order - Dismissal

11/20/2018: Order - Dismissal

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/15/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; 2. FRAUD

3/21/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; 2. FRAUD

Minute Order -

4/4/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/23/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

11/1/2017: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF OLYMFIG26, LLC APPLIES TO THE COURT EX PARTE FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (CIVIL CODE SECTION 1952.3)

11/1/2017: PLAINTIFF OLYMFIG26, LLC APPLIES TO THE COURT EX PARTE FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (CIVIL CODE SECTION 1952.3)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

11/6/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

3/16/2017: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

3/27/2017: ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

6/16/2017: Minute Order -

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Olymfig26, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal) of 11/20/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 37; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Olymfig26, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Olymfig26, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Orit Mesica (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Olymfig26, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Meller & FloYd Eric Meller (BN 54123)

Harry E. Floyd (BN 121671) A - FILED

2001 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 200 L Smwnmfbmuficmfimma.' Santa Monica, California 90403 5789 - County of Los Angeles Tel: (310) 829-0945 _

‘Fax: (310) 829-0469 - UEC 12767

'Attorneys for Plaintiff 0lymfig26, LLC Sherri R, Lamr, EXecutive b'“““’uerk | | - " . i Deputy

Moses Soto

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA - FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Olymfig26, LLC CASE NO. BC654366 UNLIMITED

| .Plaintiff, ) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO

) FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

vSs. ) ‘ ) (RESERVATION ID #: Orit Mesica, individually and ) 171101263452) dba EJ's Bites and Jino's ) Pizzeria; Does 1 to 5, ) DATE OF Inclusive, ) MOTION: January 23, 2018 ' ) TIME: 8:30 a.m. . Defendants. ) DEPT: 37 TRIAL . ’ DATE: August 21, 2018 TIME: 9:00 a.m. DEPT: 37