This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 00:12:43 (UTC).

OLSON, JACOB ERIK VS CLARK, MARCIA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 OLSON, JACOB ERIK filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CLARK, MARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1809

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLSON JACOB ERIK

Respondent

CLARK MARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SADANA KAVITA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

1/6/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

12/1/2020: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet's atty :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

12/7/2020: Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet's atty :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

Declaration

11/25/2020: Declaration

Petition - Custody and Support of Minor Child

11/25/2020: Petition - Custody and Support of Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

11/25/2020: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

11/25/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Memorandum - Points and Authorities

11/25/2020: Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - in support of petitioners request for order regarding child custody and visitation

12/1/2020: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - in support of petitioners request for order regarding child custody and visitation

Declaration - of jacob erik olson

12/1/2020: Declaration - of jacob erik olson

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

12/1/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

12/1/2020: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

Declaration - UCCJEA

12/1/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

11/25/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • Hearing03/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 202 at 7339 South Painter Ave., Whittier, CA 90602; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Clerk (Emailed to pet's atty :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of jacob erik olson ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (in support of petitioners request for order regarding child custody and visitation ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Custody and Support of Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less