Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 15:50:01 (UTC).

OLIVIA MARIE SHIELDS VS URBAN L.A. LIVING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 OLIVIA MARIE SHIELDS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against URBAN L A LIVING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5145

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIELDS OLIVIA MARIE

Defendants

VISTA 407 KENMORE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

407 S. KENMORE PARTNERS LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

URBAN L.A. LIVING

URBAN L.A. LIVING DBA URBAN L.A.LIVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SLAUGHTER WILLIAM MICHAEL

SLAUGHTER WILLIAM MICHAEL ESQ.

Other Attorneys

BELORYAN HAIK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 7, 2021 HEARING ON D...) OF 06/01/2021

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 7, 2021 HEARING ON D...) OF 06/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 7, 2021 HEARING ON D...)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE JUNE 7, 2021 HEARING ON D...)

Reply - REPLY DEFS' REPLY TO OPP RE DEMURRER

5/26/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFS' REPLY TO OPP RE DEMURRER

Reply - REPLY DEFS' REPLY TO OPP RE MOTION TO STRIKE

5/26/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFS' REPLY TO OPP RE MOTION TO STRIKE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/24/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

2/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

2/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

2/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/12/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

4/6/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

4/6/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

PI General Order

12/31/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/24/2020: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2023
  • Hearing11/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Hearing05/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (- Defendants Jemco Investments, LLC (d/b/a Urban L.A. Living and e/s/a Urban L.A. Living) and 407 S. Kenmore Partners LP's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:20 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of the June 7, 2021 Hearing on D...) of 06/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of the June 7, 2021 Hearing on D...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketReply (Defs' reply to opp re demurrer); Filed by Jemco Investments, LLC Erroneously Sued As Urban L.A. Living (Defendant); 407 S. Kenmore Partners LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant); Vista 407 Kenmore LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketReply (Defs' reply to opp re motion to strike); Filed by Jemco Investments, LLC Erroneously Sued As Urban L.A. Living (Defendant); 407 S. Kenmore Partners LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant); Vista 407 Kenmore LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Olivia Marie Shields (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Olivia Marie Shields (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Olivia Marie Shields (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Olivia Marie Shields (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Olivia Marie Shields (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Olivia Marie Shields (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Olivia Marie Shields (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV45145    Hearing Date: June 7, 2021    Dept: 29

OLIVIA MARIE SHIELDS vs URBAN L.A. LIVING, et al.

Court Order Re: Continuance of the June 7, 2021 Hearing on Demurrer/Motion to Strike to August 25, 2021

On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Defendants Jemco Investments, LLC (d/b/a Urban L.A. Living and e/s/a Urban L.A. Living) and 407 S. Kenmore Partners LP's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for 06/07/2021 is continued to 08/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 29 at Spring Street Courthouse.

Judicial Assistant is directed to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISTA 407 KENMORE LLC is a litigant