Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 21:37:30 (UTC).

OLIVER, MYLBRA C. VS HOXBY, DEREK SCOTT

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 OLIVER, MYLBRA C filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HOXBY, DEREK SCOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLIVER MYLBRA C.

Respondent

HOXBY DEREK SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

2/1/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

2/1/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/1/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/14/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

1/14/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/14/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Proof of Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less