Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 09:53:20 (UTC).

OLGA VILLATORRES VS HECTOR GONZALEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 OLGA VILLATORRES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HECTOR GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0784

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLATORRES OLGA

Defendants

GONZALEZ HECTOR

GONZALEZ HECTOR DBA THE FENCE PROS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER DELANEY L.

Defendant Attorneys

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN

BARRENO ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Answer

3/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/4/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Hearing01/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Hearing12/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Hector Gonzalez dba the Fence Pros); Filed by Hector Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hector Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Olga Villatorres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Olga Villatorres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Olga Villatorres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Olga Villatorres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Olga Villatorres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER DELANEY L.