This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 20:29:00 (UTC).

OLGA SOLOVEY, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS RUST MOVIE PRODUCTIONS, LLC., A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On February 9, 2023, Olga Solovey, Anatolii Androsovych, and Svetlana Zemko (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by John C. Carpenter of Carpenter & Zuckerman; Gloria Allred of Allred, Maroko & Goldberg; and Victor Alexandroff of Alexandroff Law Group, filed a civil lawsuit against Rust Movie Productions, LLC, Alexander R. Baldwin III, El Dorado Pictures, Inc., Ryan Donnell Smith, Langley Allen Cheney, Thomasville Pictures, LLC, Anjul Nigam, Brittany House Pictures, Hannah Gutierrez-Reed, Seth Kenney, and others (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking compensatory relief with civil penalties for alleged negligent intentional acts and/or omissions resulting in fatal injury and emotional distress. This case was filed in the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, with Judge Michael E. Whitaker presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs alleged, “On October 21st, 2021, on the set of the production, ‘Rust,’ Defendant ALEXANDER R. BALDWIN III (‘Alec Baldwin’/’DEFENDANT BALDWIN) fired a loaded gun containing a live bullet killing Director of Photography Halyna Hutchins and injuring others who were standing in the line of fire when the gun went off.”

Plaintiffs then alleged, “DEFENDANT BALDWIN committed battery against Halyna Hutchins by intentionally acting, without just cause, when pointing and discharging a loaded gun towards her that resulted in Halyna’s death.”

The plaintiffs then alleged that “the conduct of DEFENDANT BALDWIN when he pointed and discharged a loaded gun at Halyna Hutchins that killed her constituted extreme and outrageous conduct under the facts and circumstances of the ‘Rust’ filmmaking.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “DEFENDANTS, including, without limitation, DEFENDANT PRODUCERS, further had the duty to coordinate, create, and execute safety protocols and supervision for filming so as not to increase the safety risks associated with filming ‘Rust,’ a western genre film utilizing numerous weapons, including, without limitation, the gun used by DEFENDANT BALDWIN at issue in this lawsuit.”

Plaintiffs also alleged that “despite knowing that the filming of ‘Rust’ presented serious safety concerns involving ultrahazardous activities related to the use and storage of numerous firearms due to its western-inspired theme, DEFENDANTS, including, without limitation, DEFENDANT PRODUCERS, intentionally opted to produce ‘Rust’ on a low budget that was known to create unsafe conditions for movie production crew members and failed to secure weapons and ammunition.”

Additionally, the plaintiffs alleged, “The events that led to the shooting by Alec Baldwin of a loaded gun constituted intentional acts and/or omissions, without any just cause or excuse, by him and the Producers of ‘Rust.’ Mr. Baldwin chose to play Russian Roulette with a loaded gun without checking it and without having the Armorer do so. His behavior and that of the Producers on ‘Rust’ were intentional acts and/or omissions, without any just cause or excuse and with utter disregard of the consequences of said acts and/or omissions. The fact that live ammunition was allowed on a movie set, that guns and ammunition were left unattended, that the gun in question was handed to Alec Baldwin by the Assistant Director who had no business doing so, and that safety bulletins were not promulgated or ignored, coupled with the fact that the scene in question did not call for a gun to be fired at all, makes this a case where injury or death was much more than just a possibility – it was a likely result.”

Plaintiffs presented four claims for relief, including claims for alleged battery, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and negligence.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested an award of compensatory and punitive damages as well as civil penalties with pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2819

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

DOUGLAS W. STERN

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDROSOVYCH AN INDIVIDUAL ANATOLII

Defendants

3RD SHIFT MEDIA LLC A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BALDWIN III AN INDIVIDUAL ALEXANDER R.

BRITTANY HOUSE PICTURES A BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

CALVARY MEDIA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

CHENEY AN INDIVIDUAL LANGLEY ALLEN

DELPIANO AN INDIVIDUAL MATTHEW

EL DORADO PICTURES INC. CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GUTIERREZ-REED AN INDIVIDUAL HANNAH

HALLS AN INDIVIDUAL DAVID

KENNEY AN INDIVIDUAL SETH

KLINGHER AN INDIVIDUAL NATHAN

LAMB AN INDIVIDUAL JENNIFER

NIGAM AN INDIVIDUAL ANJUL

PDQ ARM AND PROP LLC A NEW MEXICO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PICKEL AN INDIVIDUAL GABRIELLE

RUST MOVIE PRODUCTIONS LLC. A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SALVESON AN INDIVIDUAL EMILY

SHARP AN INDIVIDUAL CHRIS M.B.

SHORT PORCH PICTURES LLC A DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER JOHN C.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHWARTZ ROBERT M.

JOSEPH DANE F

FOX DANA ALDEN

AREVALO ERIC

SCHANTZ-BEKKEN KATHERINE S.

CARPENTER ELIZABETH JANE

HUMPHREY JEFFREY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

9/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF ITS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

9/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF ITS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/30/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/30/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATY S. BEKKEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

8/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATY S. BEKKEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT SETH KENNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

8/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT SETH KENNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT SETH KENNEY ON BEHALF OF PDQ ARM AND PROP, LLC IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

8/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT SETH KENNEY ON BEHALF OF PDQ ARM AND PROP, LLC IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/15/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANE F. JOSEPH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTT

7/31/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANE F. JOSEPH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HANNAH GUTIERREZ-REED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

7/31/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HANNAH GUTIERREZ-REED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

7/31/2023: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

85 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2024
  • Hearing06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2024
  • Hearing03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2024
  • Hearing02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) of Matthew Delpiano scheduled for 03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketNotice DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF ITS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; Filed by: RUST MOVIE PRODUCTIONS, LLC., a domestic limited liability company (Defendant); RYAN DONNELL SMITH, an individual (Defendant); LANGLEY ALLEN CHENEY, an individual (Defendant); THOMASVILLE PICTURES, LLC, a domestic limited liability company (Defendant); As to: OLGA SOLOVEY, an individual (Plaintiff); SVETLANA ZEMKO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketNotice DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT; Filed by: RUST MOVIE PRODUCTIONS, LLC., a domestic limited liability company (Defendant); RYAN DONNELL SMITH, an individual (Defendant); LANGLEY ALLEN CHENEY, an individual (Defendant); THOMASVILLE PICTURES, LLC, a domestic limited liability company (Defendant); As to: OLGA SOLOVEY, an individual (Plaintiff); SVETLANA ZEMKO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 51 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- John C. Carpenter (Attorney): Last Name changed from Carpenter, to Carpenter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OLGA SOLOVEY, an individual (Plaintiff); ANATOLII ANDROSOVYCH an individual (Plaintiff); SVETLANA ZEMKO (Plaintiff); As to: RUST MOVIE PRODUCTIONS, LLC., a domestic limited liability company (Defendant); ALEXANDER R. BALDWIN III, an individual (Defendant); EL DORADO PICTURES, INC., California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: OLGA SOLOVEY, an individual (Plaintiff); ANATOLII ANDROSOVYCH an individual (Plaintiff); SVETLANA ZEMKO (Plaintiff); As to: RUST MOVIE PRODUCTIONS, LLC., a domestic limited liability company (Defendant); ALEXANDER R. BALDWIN III, an individual (Defendant); EL DORADO PICTURES, INC., California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less