This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 05:41:42 (UTC).

OLGA IAKYM, ET AL. VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 OLGA IAKYM, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2264

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IAKYM OLGA

KONOVALOFF ALEXANDER

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

ROTMAN AMY

Defendant Attorneys

WAGNER C. BRIAN

LEACH BRIAN E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/17/2023: Notice of Ruling

Answer

3/17/2023: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) OF 03/15/2023

3/15/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT) OF 03/15/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT)

Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC., D/B/A BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS

3/15/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC., D/B/A BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC., D/B/A BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS

3/13/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC., D/B/A BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/24/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Association of Attorney

2/21/2023: Association of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/21/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/15/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/15/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AARON GRENER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL LEGAL PROCEEDINGS

2/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AARON GRENER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL LEGAL PROCEEDINGS

Answer

1/20/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC. d/b/a BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS Erroneously Sued As BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC. d/b/a BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS Erroneously Sued As BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Filed By: Olga Iakym (Plaintiff),Alexander Konovaloff (Plaintiff); Result: Vacated ; Result Date: 03/15/2023 ; As To Parties changed from BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant) to SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC. d/b/a BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS Erroneously Sued As BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC., D/B/A BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS: Status Date changed from 03/10/2023 to 03/15/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Olga Iakym (Plaintiff) to Olga Iakym (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default) of 03/15/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Olga Iakym, et al. on 12/06/2022, Default entered on 02/21/2023, Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC., D/B/A BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS; Filed by: SHERMAN OAKS-B, INC. d/b/a BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS Erroneously Sued As BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/08/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Olga Iakym (Plaintiff); Alexander Konovaloff (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Olga Iakym (Plaintiff); Alexander Konovaloff (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Olga Iakym (Plaintiff); Alexander Konovaloff (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); BMW of Sherman Oaks, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less