Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 05:20:01 (UTC).

OLEG SOLOVIEV VS ALICE KOWALSKI

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 OLEG SOLOVIEV filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against ALICE KOWALSKI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3280

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLOVIEV OLEG

Defendant

KOWALSKI ALICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEER GREGORY B.

STONE JASON M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • Hearing08/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by OLEG SOLOVIEV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by OLEG SOLOVIEV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by OLEG SOLOVIEV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by OLEG SOLOVIEV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEER GREGORY B.