This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 10:07:53 (UTC).

OLEAS, FRANCISCO VS OLEAS, JESSICA MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 OLEAS, FRANCISCO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against OLEAS, JESSICA MARIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2321

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLEAS FRANCISCO

Respondent

OLEAS JESSICA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELKADDOUM ROCKY

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/4/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons - Summons

3/1/2022: Summons - Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/1/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/1/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

3/1/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service of Summons

3/18/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less