This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 07:27:43 (UTC).

OLDEN WALLACE VS INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 OLDEN WALLACE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4849

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALLACE OLDEN

Defendant

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS MANSFIELD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/2/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (WALLACE-22STCCV24849))

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (WALLACE-22STCCV24849))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (WALLACE-22STCCV24849))

12/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (WALLACE-22STCCV24849))

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: OLDEN WALLACE (Plaintiff); As to: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); Service Date: 10/21/2022; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference (WALLACE-22STCCV24849))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference (WALLACE-22STCCV24849) scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/23/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference (WALLACE-22STCCV24849))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Initial Status Conference (WALLACE-22STCCV24849) scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/08/2022 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: OLDEN WALLACE (Plaintiff); As to: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: OLDEN WALLACE (Plaintiff); As to: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OLDEN WALLACE (Plaintiff); As to: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant