*******0315
02/02/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Other Property
Los Angeles, California
PETER A. HERNANDEZ
OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY
KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION
KING OF ALL TRADES INC. DOE 1
LLOYD PRISCILLA
AV SANDRA
9/12/2023: Notice of Settlement
9/12/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
8/29/2023: Case Management Statement
8/24/2023: Case Management Statement
8/1/2023: Substitution of Attorney
7/27/2023: Answer
7/27/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
7/14/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
7/3/2023: Answer
6/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
6/15/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
6/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service
5/31/2023: Case Management Statement
5/24/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
5/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION FILED
5/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION FILED
5/11/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Hearing01/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/12/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/28/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant); King of All Trades, Inc. (Doe 1) (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Sandra Av (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Garber, Av &Duncan to Sandra Av Esq
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department L Pomona Courthouse South
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read Less