This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 03:29:00 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY VS KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0315

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION

KING OF ALL TRADES INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LLOYD PRISCILLA

Defendant Attorney

AV SANDRA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

9/12/2023: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/12/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Case Management Statement

8/29/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

8/1/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

7/27/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/27/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/3/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

6/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/15/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

6/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

5/31/2023: Case Management Statement

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/24/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION FILED

5/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION FILED

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION FILED

5/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION FILED

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2024

Hearing01/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant); King of All Trades, Inc. (Doe 1) (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketUpdated -- Sandra Av (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Garber, Av &Duncan to Sandra Av Esq

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
02/02/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department L Pomona Courthouse South

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketNotice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less