This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 02:16:40 (UTC).

OLD EARL SCHEIB PAINT AND BODY, A CORPORATION, ET AL. VS ACAR LEASING LTD.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 OLD EARL SCHEIB PAINT AND BODY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACAR LEASING LTD . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0811

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

315 AUTOMOTIVE INC. A CORPORATION

OLD EARL SCHEIB PAINT AND BODY A CORPORATION

Defendants

ACAR LEASING LTD. DBA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED A CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY

SMITH AN INDIVIDUAL STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D

Defendant Attorney

ERNEST STEVEN E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order - ORDER STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

7/29/2021: Order - ORDER STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMEN

7/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMEN

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

9/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING ACAR LEASING LTD., DBA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION

1/6/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING ACAR LEASING LTD., DBA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION

Case Management Statement

1/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/29/2021: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Allowing Acar Leasing Ltd., dba GM Financial Leasing Limited to file a Cross-Complaint in this Action); Filed by Acar Leasing LTD., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Acar Leasing LTD., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff); 315 Automotive, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff); 315 Automotive, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Acar Leasing LTD., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder (STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES); Filed by California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES); Filed by California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff); 315 Automotive, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff); 315 Automotive, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Old Earl Scheib Paint And Body, a corporation (Plaintiff); 315 Automotive, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACAR LEASING LTD. AKA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERNEST STEVEN E