This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 11:29:41 (UTC).

OGEBE, LUCINA VS OGEBE, FRANCIS

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 OGEBE, LUCINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against OGEBE, FRANCIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3045

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OGEBE LUCINA

Respondent

OGEBE FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAFRANCE JONATHAN BAXTER

Respondent Attorney

DURON PAUL J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

7/22/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

7/27/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/3/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/3/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

5/3/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service of Summons

4/2/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/18/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/18/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/18/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

3/18/2021: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

3/23/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/23/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAFRANCE JONATHAN BAXTER