This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 12:51:53 (UTC).

OGANES GARIBYAN VS DORON KOREN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 OGANES GARIBYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DORON KOREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1571

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARIBYAN OGANES

Defendants

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

KOREN DORON

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS BRYAN M.

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER SCOTT DAVID

CHARBONEAU ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/19/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/1/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/24/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demand for Jury Trial

9/22/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/22/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST DEMURRER HEARING BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

12/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST DEMURRER HEARING BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/1/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • Hearing08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (Filing of First Amended Complaint and Request Demurrer Hearing be Taken Off Calendar); Filed by Oganes Garibyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Oganes Garibyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Doron Koren (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Doron Koren (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Oganes Garibyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Oganes Garibyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Oganes Garibyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV31571    Hearing Date: December 14, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

OGANES GARIBYAN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

DORON KOREN, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: 20STCV31571

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC’S DEMURRER

Dept. 27

3:30 p.m.

December 14, 2020

On August 19, 2020, Plaintiff Oganes Garibyan filed this action against Defendants Doron Koren and Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (“Defendant”).  On September 24, 2020, Defendant filed a demurrer.  On December 1, 2020, Plaintiff filed an amended complaint.  

A party may amend its pleading once without leave of court at any time before the answer, demurrer, or motion to strike is filed, or after a demurrer or motion to strike is filed but before the demurrer or motion to strike is heard if the amended pleading is filed and served no later than the date for filing an opposition to the demurrer or motion to strike.  A party may amend the pleading after the date for filing an opposition to the demurrer or motion to strike, upon stipulation by the parties.  The time for responding to an amended pleading shall be computed from the date of service of the amended pleading.”  (Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 472 (a).)

Plaintiff timely filed a First Amended Complaint.  Accordingly, Defendant’s Demurrer is DENIED as moot. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 14th day of December 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. 

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS BRYAN M.