This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 04:26:36 (UTC).

OGANES BOYADZHYAN ET AL VS POLARIS INDUSTRIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 OGANES BOYADZHYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against POLARIS INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4515

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOYADZHYAN OGANES

BOYADZHYAN KARINE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EXOTIC CAR RENTALS DTLA

MOTORINI INC. DBA LA CYCLESPORTS

POLARIS INDUSTRIES INC.

RA GLOBAL RESOURCES LLC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

MOTORINI INC. DBA LA CYCLESPORTS

ROES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HAFFNER JOSHUA H. ESQ.

MARTINIAN TIGRAN ESQ.

HAFFNER JOSHUA H

MARTINIAN TIGRAN

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LU ROBERT K.

YUKEVICH CAVANAUGH

JOHNSON MICHAEL DAVID

LEONARD EDWARD R.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LU ROBERT K

MILLER DELANEY L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE ; AND ETC

11/22/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE ; AND ETC

Unknown

11/22/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANT POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC.?S ANSWER TO RA GLOBAL RESOURCES, LLC D/B/A EXOTIC CAR RENTAL COMPANY, LLC?S CROSSCOMPLAINT

3/22/2018: DEFENDANT POLARIS INDUSTRIES, INC.?S ANSWER TO RA GLOBAL RESOURCES, LLC D/B/A EXOTIC CAR RENTAL COMPANY, LLC?S CROSSCOMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order

11/20/2018: Stipulation and Order

Notice

12/6/2018: Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

1/11/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

1/11/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/24/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/30/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration

2/1/2019: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

2/1/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/1/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice

2/1/2019: Notice

Cross-Complaint

2/8/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons

2/14/2019: Summons

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice

3/1/2019: Notice

Answer

3/15/2019: Answer

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Polaris Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Karine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff); Oganes Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for a Court Order Continuing the Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Exotic Car Rentals DTLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFENDANT RA GLOBAL RESOURCES, LLC D/B/A EXOTIC CAR RENTAL DTLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Karine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff); Oganes Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Karine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff); Oganes Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff); Oganes Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE ; AND ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4515    Hearing Date: March 26, 2021    Dept: E

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

[CCP ; 473(b)]

Date: 3/26/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Oganes Boyadzhyan et al. v. Polaris Industries, Inc. et al. (****4515)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant LAGH Enterprises, Inc.’s Motion to Set Aside Default is GRANTED, on the condition that LAGH Enterprises, Inc. file the proposed Answer attached to its counsel’s declaration as Exhibit 1.

Plaintiffs Oganes Boyadzhyan and Karine Boyadzhyan filed a partial non-opposition indicating that they do not oppose LAGH Enterprises, Inc.’s (“LAGH”) motion to set aside the default on the condition that LAGH is ordered to file an answer. Plaintiffs attempted to obtain a stipulation from LAGH, which provided that the default would be set aside and LAGH would file an answer. (Kitterman Decl. ¶¶ 2-4 & Ex. A.) According to an email dated March 3, 2021, LAGH would not agree to the stipulation and indicated its intent to request permission from the Court to file a demurrer. (Kitterman Decl. ¶ 4 & Ex. A.)

CCP ; 473(b) requires the party seeking to set aside a default to accompany its application with a copy of the proposed “answer or other pleading” to be filed in the action, or “otherwise the application shall not be granted.” LAGH filed a proposed answer, not a proposed demurrer. (Keshishian Decl. ¶ 11 & Ex. 1.) Because LAGH did not propose to file a demurrer in this action, it may not file one in lieu of the proposed answer on which the instant motion is premised.

The motion is GRANTED. The default entered against LAGH Enterprises, Inc. on September 25, 2020 is VACATED. No later than five (5) court days from this hearing, defendant LAGH Enterprises, Inc. is ordered to file the proposed Answer attached to its counsel’s declaration as Exhibit 1.



Case Number: ****4515    Hearing Date: January 31, 2020    Dept: E

MOTION FOR: (1) DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; AND (2) SEALING REFERENCES TO SETTLEMENT AMOUNT

Date: 1/31/20

Case: Boyadzhyan, et al. v. Polaris Industries, Inc., et al. (BC 684515)

TENTATIVE RULING:

I. GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

 

Defendant Polaris Inc.’s UNOPPOSED Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is GRANTED. (See City of Grand Terrace v. Superior Court (1987) 192 Cal.App.3d 1251, 1261 [upon presentation of evidence of good faith of the settlement, the burden is on any challenging party to establish lack of good faith].) The Court determines that the settlement entered by plaintiffs Oganes Boyadzhyan and Karine Boyadzhyan and moving defendant was entered into in good faith.

Defendant Polaris Inc.is discharged from all liability on claims for equitable contribution and/or full or partial indemnity by other parties, joint tortfeasors, or co-obligors, in this or any other action arising from the same general set of facts.

II. MOTION TO SEAL

Defendant Polaris Inc.’s Motion for an Order to Seal References to Settlement Amount is GRANTED, subject to Polaris Inc. re-lodging with the Court of an unredacted copy as set forth below by 2/7/20.

The Court finds that: (1) There exists an overriding interest that overcome the right of public access to the records, namely, the interest of the parties in plaintiffs in complying with their agreement not to disclose the settlement terms or amount; (2) The overriding interest supports sealing the records; (3) A substantial probability exists that the overriding interest will be prejudiced if the records are not sealed; (4) The proposed sealing is narrowly tailored under the circumstances; and (5) No less restrictive means exist to achieve the overriding interests.

The Court makes such findings based on the fact that defendant has established the settlement agreement contains a provision not to disclose the terms of the agreement. However, the unredacted copy lodged with the Court did not comply with Cal. Rule of Court 2.251(b)(5), because the cover of the unredacted version did not identify it as “May Not Be Examined Without Court Order-Contains material from conditionally sealed record.” The unredacted Confidential Statement of Terms of Settlement between Defendant/Cross-Defendant Polaris Inc. and Plaintiffs Oganes and Karine Boyadzhyan lodged with the Court shall be returned to Polaris Inc. upon its re-lodging with the Court an unredacted copy in accordance herewith.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RA Global Resources, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where POLARIS INDUSTRIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER DELANEY L.