This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 14:07:12 (UTC).

OFELIA RESENDEZ VS MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 OFELIA RESENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8805

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

RESENDEZ OFELIA

Defendants

GENESIS HEALTHCARE INC.

SUMMIT CARE LLC

GENESIS HEALTH CARE CORPORATION

GENESIS HEALTHCARE INC. [DOE 2]

MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER LLC

Respondents

SUMMIT CARE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENESIS HEALTH CARE CORPORATION A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MUNRO ELIZABETH C.

PACHECO MARINA R.

Petitioner Attorney

PACHECO MARINA

Defendant Attorney

CROSS LISA A.

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY REPLY OF DEFT MONTEBELLOW CARE CENTER, LLC, TO PLTF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/6/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY OF DEFT MONTEBELLOW CARE CENTER, LLC, TO PLTF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Other - - OTHER - RULING RE: DEFENDANT MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/13/2019: Other - - OTHER - RULING RE: DEFENDANT MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)]

12/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)]

Case Management Statement

12/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF OFELIA RESENDEZS SURREPLY REGARDING DEFENDANT MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER, LLCS MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO ARBITRATE THE CONTROVERSY AND STAYING THE ACTION

12/27/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF OFELIA RESENDEZS SURREPLY REGARDING DEFENDANT MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER, LLCS MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO ARBITRATE THE CONTROVERSY AND STAYING THE ACTION

Response - RESPONSE OF DEFT MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER TO PLTF'S SUR-REPLY REGARDING DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/30/2019: Response - RESPONSE OF DEFT MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER TO PLTF'S SUR-REPLY REGARDING DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service by Mail

1/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...) OF 01/03/2020

1/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...) OF 01/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

1/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/14/2020

12/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONT...)

12/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONT...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

12/29/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONT...) OF 12/29/2020

12/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONT...) OF 12/29/2020

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF RULING REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON); Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docketat 3:10 PM in Department 78; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Cont...) of 12/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Cont...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Montebello Care Center, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (and Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ofelia Resendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENESIS HEALTH CARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where GENESIS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SUMMIT CARE LLC is a litigant