This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 12:25:14 (UTC).

OFELIA OHANIAN VS JOHN W COLVERT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 OFELIA OHANIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN W COLVERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2430

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OHANIAN OFELIA

Defendants

COLVERT JOHN W

EXECUTIVE CAR LEASING COMPANY

H.L. MOE CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN JAKE R.

Defendant Attorney

CRANERT TERRENCE L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/20/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/20/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/20/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/20/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/25/2022: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2025
  • Hearing01/16/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John W Colvert (Defendant); H.L. Moe Co., Inc. (Defendant); Executive Car Leasing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by John W Colvert (Defendant); H.L. Moe Co., Inc. (Defendant); Executive Car Leasing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ofelia Ohanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ofelia Ohanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ofelia Ohanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ofelia Ohanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ofelia Ohanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ofelia Ohanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ofelia Ohanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H.L. MOE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Executive Car Leasing Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN JAKE R.