This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 08:59:40 (UTC).

ODNOVOL, ELENA VS ODNOVOL, GRIGORY G.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 ODNOVOL, ELENA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ODNOVOL, GRIGORY G. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COCHRAN, STEVE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1575

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COCHRAN, STEVE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ODNOVOL ELENA

Respondent

ODNOVOL GRIGORY G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SEIDEL JOEL STUART

Respondent Attorney

AKBARIAN ANIE N. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Deposit Slip - For PPA 2 Fee of $975.00

12/20/2022: Civil Deposit Slip - For PPA 2 Fee of $975.00

Order - Appointing Minor's Counsel

12/21/2022: Order - Appointing Minor's Counsel

Minute Order

12/20/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/20/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/20/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/6/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/26/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/26/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/26/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/9/2023: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration

3/9/2023: Declaration - Declaration

Ex Parte RFO Emergency Orders for Support

3/9/2023: Ex Parte RFO Emergency Orders for Support

Proposed Ex Parte RFO Emergency Orders for Support - Ex Parte - Application

3/8/2023: Proposed Ex Parte RFO Emergency Orders for Support - Ex Parte - Application

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

3/6/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Statement - Separate - Statement - Separate

3/3/2023: Statement - Separate - Statement - Separate

FL_General Family Law - FL - Court Order FCCRC (FAM112) and Divorce Checklist (FAM110)

3/3/2023: FL_General Family Law - FL - Court Order FCCRC (FAM112) and Divorce Checklist (FAM110)

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

3/3/2023: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

RFO/MTN - Compel Initial - Compel Further Supp'l Response to Demand for Production of Documents; Monetary sanctions not less than $6,755

3/3/2023: RFO/MTN - Compel Initial - Compel Further Supp'l Response to Demand for Production of Documents; Monetary sanctions not less than $6,755

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 63 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFO - Compel Initial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 63 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFOMOD - Custody, Visitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 63 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFOMOD - Custody, Visitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 63 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFO - Family Law

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 63 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Short Cause Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 63 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 63, Cochran, Steve, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketEx Parte RFO Emergency Orders for Support

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ); Filed by Child

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less