This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 00:48:49 (UTC).

OCTAVIO JARAMILLO VS JUAN A FLORES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by OCTAVIO JARAMILLO against JUAN A FLORES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0115

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JARAMILLO OCTAVIO

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

RINCON RENE

FLORES JUAN A.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT JUAN A. FLORES'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/20/2018: DEFENDANT JUAN A. FLORES'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/20/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Demand for Jury Trial

2/4/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/27/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Related Case

4/25/2019: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation and Order

6/12/2019: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

6/21/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

6/21/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

6/24/2019: Minute Order

Notice

6/25/2019: Notice

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/9/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/9/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/9/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/9/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

1/12/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) NEGLIGENCE

1/12/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS

1/12/2018: SUMMONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Court Minute Orders RE Notice of Related Cases); Filed by Juan A. Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANT FOR AN ORDER CONSOLIDATING THIS ACTION WITH 19STCV10298 FOR ALL PURPOSES); Filed by Juan A. Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For an Order Consolidating this action with 19STCV10298 for all purposes) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order Consolidating th...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Related Case; Having read...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (For an Order Consolidating this action with 19STCV10298 for all purposes); Filed by Juan A. Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Related Case; Having read...) of 06/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (to Consolidate Cases for Trial - Address this Request by a properly noticed Motion to Consolidate); Filed by Juan A. Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Rene Rincon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Rene Rincon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Octavio Jaramillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690115    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 2

Jaramillo v. Flores

Plaintiffs’ Motion to Consolidate filed on 9/23/19 is GRANTED.

On 6/21/19, Department 2 related BC690115 with 19STCV10298 and designated BC690115 as the lead case. Accordingly, the effective trial date is 2/9/2020. All dates set in 19STCV10298 are vacated.

The decision to consolidate is a matter for the court’s discretion. Muller v. Robinson (1959) 174 Cal. App. 2d 511, 515.

Consolidation is appropriate since both cases arise from the same accident, involve substantially the same parties, and common questions of law or fact are pending. Consolidation will avoid inconsistent judgments. Cal. Code Civ. Proc. § 1048(a).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.