This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2020 at 07:17:54 (UTC).

OCTAVIO CRUZ VS JOSE ORDONEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/28/2018 OCTAVIO CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ORDONEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9829

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CRUZ OCTAVIO

Defendants and Respondents

SHOWCASE FACILITY SOLUTIONS

DOES 1 TO 25

ORDONEZ JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MITCHELL TIMOTHY P. ESQ.

MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MOSIER CHRISTOPHER

MOSIER CHRISTOPHER CRAIG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/29/2020

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

4/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

2/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF [TENTATIVE] ORDER TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY WITNESS MICHAEL ARMENDARIZ'S COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION BY SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA

1/31/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF [TENTATIVE] ORDER TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY WITNESS MICHAEL ARMENDARIZ'S COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION BY SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

2/6/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL NON PARTY WITNESS MICHAEL ARMENDA...) OF 01/22/2020

1/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL NON PARTY WITNESS MICHAEL ARMENDA...) OF 01/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL NON PARTY WITNESS MICHAEL ARMENDA...)

1/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL NON PARTY WITNESS MICHAEL ARMENDA...)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NON PARTY WITNESS

12/12/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF NON PARTY WITNESS

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/28/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/12/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/24/2019: Answer

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/12/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Order - -CLASS ACTION INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

4/9/2018: Order - -CLASS ACTION INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

CoverSheet -

3/28/2018: CoverSheet -

Summons -

3/28/2018: Summons -

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Octavio Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement ((unconditional)); Filed by Octavio Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; Filed by Jose Ordonez (Defendant); Showcase Facility Solutions (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For An Order To Continue The Trial Date, Filed by the Defendantss) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Octavio Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Showcase Facility Solutions (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Octavio Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketOrder -CLASS ACTION INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Octavio Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Octavio Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699829    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 29

Cruz v. Ordonez, et al.

Motion to Compel Non-Party Witness Michael Armendariz’s Compliance with Defendants’ Notice of Taking Deposition by Subpoena and Deposition Subpoena for Personal Appearance, filed on 12/12/2019 by Defendants Jose Ordonez and Showcase Facility Solutions is DENIED.

Defendants contend that they first served a deposition subpoena on Mr. Amendariz on August 15, 2019, but the deposition did not go forward on the noticed date and was rescheduled. They contend that a second deposition subpoena was served on September 3, 2019 for a deposition on September 17, 2019, but Mr. Amendariz failed to appear and his non-appearance was taken. They now seek an order compelling his appearance. No opposition was filed.

A deposition subpoena for the attendance of a non-party witness must be personally served on the witness. Code Civ. Proc. § 2020.220(c). The record here does not reflect that any deposition subpoena was personally served on Mr. Amendariz and does not reflect any agreement by Mr. Amendariz to accept service of a subpoena by mail. Defendants are thus not entitled to an order compelling Mr. Amendariz’s attendance.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.