This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 05:39:02 (UTC).

OCHSE, ALYSHIA VS KNAZ, LEE

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 OCHSE, ALYSHIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KNAZ, LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIPNER, JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2890

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIPNER, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OCHSE ALYSHIA

Respondent

KNAZ LEE

 

Court Documents

Judgment

5/26/2022: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

5/26/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

6/1/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

Declaration - Default FL170

3/24/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

3/24/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

3/24/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Stipulation and Order - Re Child Support and Spousal Support

7/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - Re Child Support and Spousal Support

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/7/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Notice - OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED 2/17/2021

5/12/2021: Notice - OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED 2/17/2021

Stipulation and Order - re: Pendente Lite Custody of Minor Children Veeda Knaz; Order Thereon

5/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - re: Pendente Lite Custody of Minor Children Veeda Knaz; Order Thereon

Minute Order

5/25/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail

3/17/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

3/17/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

3/15/2021: Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

Substitution of Attorney

2/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - Income and Expense

2/17/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

2/17/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/23/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (426 Reviewed ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re Child Support and Spousal Support ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 83, Lipner, Joseph, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less