This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 02:44:20 (UTC).

OCEANVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS DAVID PINEDA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 OCEANVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID PINEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8128

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEANVIEW MEDICAL CENTER INC.

Defendants

MGDESYAN LAW FIRM

PINEDA DAVID

MGDESYAN GEORGE

FIRM MGDESYAN LAW

MGDESYAN GEORGE DBA MGDESYAN LAW FROM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHABEL SCOTT LEE

Defendant Attorney

MGDESYAN GEORGE GEVORK

 

Court Documents

Reply

4/4/2019: Reply

Opposition

3/28/2019: Opposition

Order

2/4/2019: Order

Notice of Ruling

2/1/2019: Notice of Ruling

Memorandum

1/9/2019: Memorandum

Memorandum

1/9/2019: Memorandum

Summons

7/16/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment

7/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/16/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Motion for Order

12/14/2018: Motion for Order

Separate Statement

12/14/2018: Separate Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

12/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

11/15/2018: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Minute Order

11/14/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

7/16/2018: SUMMONS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of All Unserved Defendant's) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Oceanview Medical Center Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Terminating Sanctions); Filed by Oceanview Medical Center Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Opposition (to plaintiffs motion for terminating sanctions for misuse of the discovery process); Filed by Mgdesyan Law Firm, APLC Erroneously Sued As George Mgdesyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by David Pineda (Defendant); Mgdesyan Law Firm, APLC Erroneously Sued As George Mgdesyan (Defendant); MGDESYAN LAW FIRM (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGDESYAN LAW FIRM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHABEL SCOTT LEE ESQ.