This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 12:34:25 (UTC).

OC MODELING LLC ET AL VS JASON QUINAN

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 OC MODELING LLC filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against JASON QUINAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0452

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

IML GROUP LLC

OC MODELING LLC

NU VISION MEDIA LLC

Defendant and Respondent

QUINLAN JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RIGNEY CATHERINE ESQ

Defendant Attorney

OSHER JEREMY J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON QUENLAN

5/17/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON QUENLAN

DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN BAUMGARTNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STA

5/23/2018: DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN BAUMGARTNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STA

DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/23/2018: DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

5/23/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

3/2/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

Proof of Service

2/8/2018: Proof of Service

AMENDED JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

11/13/2017: AMENDED JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN BAUMGARTNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

5/17/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN BAUMGARTNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

AMENDMENT TO APPLJCATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

11/13/2017: AMENDMENT TO APPLJCATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OR OTHER ENFORCEMENT

11/13/2017: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OR OTHER ENFORCEMENT

RULING

6/8/2018: RULING

DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; ETC.

3/2/2018: DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; ETC.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

5/17/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

Minute Order

5/31/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

8/3/2017: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; ETC

5/17/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; ETC

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Order; Filed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 17; Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN BAUMGARTNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DEFENDANT JASON QUINLAN'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Brief-Reply; Filed by Jason Quinlan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO APPLJCATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OR OTHER ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • AMENDED JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Sister State Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less