Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 01:13:17 (UTC).

OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES VS ACS TRUCKING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ACS TRUCKING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5755

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES

Defendants

GOMEZ MIGUEL

ACS TRUCKING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

3/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Request for Dismissal

4/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

2/16/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACS TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Hom is a litigant