Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 04:13:27 (UTC).

NVERIK GRACHIAN VS KENWOOD STREET HOLDINGS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 NVERIK GRACHIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KENWOOD STREET HOLDINGS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8624

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRACHIAN NVERIK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KENWOOD STREET HOLDINGS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Defendant

CALIFORNIA COAST PLUMBING & REPIPING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRAMIJYAN ARMEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MACKEY ROBERT T.

WAYNE ADAM E.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

2/22/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIP AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/9/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/28/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/22/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

12/22/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2023
  • Hearing12/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kenwood Street Holdings, LLC, a limited liability company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Kenwood Street Holdings, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Kenwood Street Holdings, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stip and Order for Leave to File Cross-Complaint); Filed by Kenwood Street Holdings, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kenwood Street Holdings, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kenwood Street Holdings, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nverik Grachian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nverik Grachian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nverik Grachian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nverik Grachian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKEY ROBERT THOMAS