This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 17:25:04 (UTC).

NUTSIRI KIDKUL VS CITIGROUP INVESTMENTS INC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 NUTSIRI KIDKUL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITIGROUP INVESTMENTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2129

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDKUL NUTSIRI

Defendant

CITIGROUP INVESTMENTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUZARI AZAR

Defendant Attorney

LEGITTINO TRICIA L.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1/31/2018: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

1/31/2018: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

5/22/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

8/3/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order -

8/2/2018: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

8/15/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nutsiri Kidkul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Citigroup Investments Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Nutsiri Kidkul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nutsiri Kidkul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nutsiri Kidkul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIGROUP INVESTMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGITTINO TRICIA L