This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2019 at 06:22:44 (UTC).

NURILLOHON PASHASHAYEV VS WOODWARD INC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 NURILLOHON PASHASHAYEV filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WOODWARD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5226

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

PASHASHAYEV NURILLOHON

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

WOODWARD INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

VOGEL BRIAN I. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LA PAUL HASTINGS LLP

DAVIS FELICIA ANNE

 

Court Documents

AMENDED SUMMONS

6/25/2018: AMENDED SUMMONS

JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

6/26/2018: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

8/1/2018: Minute Order -

Proof of Service -

8/24/2018: Proof of Service -

DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/24/2018: DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/24/2018: DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

9/26/2018: DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

DECLARATION OF JARRYD M. COOPER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/26/2018: DECLARATION OF JARRYD M. COOPER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WOODWARD HRT, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice of Ruling - Regarding Defendant Woodward HRT, Inc.'s Demurrer, Defendant Woodward HRT, Inc.'s Motion to Strike, and the Case Management Conference

10/9/2018: Notice of Ruling - Regarding Defendant Woodward HRT, Inc.'s Demurrer, Defendant Woodward HRT, Inc.'s Motion to Strike, and the Case Management Conference

Answer

4/4/2019: Answer

Brief - DEFENDANTS WOODWARD HRT, INC. AND WOODWARD, INC.'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/5/2019: Brief - DEFENDANTS WOODWARD HRT, INC. AND WOODWARD, INC.'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Motion for Summary Judgment

4/5/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/5/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order -

4/24/2018: Minute Order -

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 56; Jury Trial (Trial) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nurillohon Pashashayev (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 56; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. CONSTRUCTIVE TORTIOUS DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nurillohon Pashashayev (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodward on behalf of CWS Compensation., Robert N is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOGEL, BRIAN I