This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 01:27:39 (UTC).

NUMEDIA LAW PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, DBA THE KERNAN LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION VS DANIEL BEYER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 NUMEDIA LAW PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, DBA THE KERNAN LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL BEYER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6390

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUMEDIA LAW PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION DBA THE KERNAN LAW FIRM A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Defendants

EVO BEVERLY HILLS

BEYER DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATRINAK RAYMOND PAUL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

6/9/2021: Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF S. MICHAEL KERNAN IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT

6/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF S. MICHAEL KERNAN IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/10/2021

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/30/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF R. PAUL KATRINAK RE CMC AND OSC

11/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF R. PAUL KATRINAK RE CMC AND OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

11/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

9/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF R. PAUL KATRINAK RE: CMC

7/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF R. PAUL KATRINAK RE: CMC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • Hearing08/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Hearing08/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:28 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to Unserved Defendants) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of S. Michael Kernan in Support of Court Judgment); Filed by NuMedia Law Professional Corporation, dba The Kernan Law Firm, a professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketBrief (in support of Request for Court Judgment); Filed by NuMedia Law Professional Corporation, dba The Kernan Law Firm, a professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of R. Paul Katrinak re: CMC); Filed by NuMedia Law Professional Corporation, dba The Kernan Law Firm, a professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docketat 11:34 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NuMedia Law Professional Corporation, dba The Kernan Law Firm, a professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NuMedia Law Professional Corporation, dba The Kernan Law Firm, a professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NuMedia Law Professional Corporation, dba The Kernan Law Firm, a professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATRINAK RAYMOND PAUL