This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 23:52:16 (UTC).

NUMARK TRANSPORTATION, INC. VS SYSCO CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 NUMARK TRANSPORTATION, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SYSCO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0154

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUMARK TRANSPORTATION INC.

Defendants

LIZARRAGA AFREDO ALONSO

FOOD SVCS LA INC. SYSCO

SYSCO LOS ANGELES INC.

SYSCO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRITZER ANNE C

GRITZER ANNE COBBLEDICK ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

TORRES RONNIE E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/6/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/27/2019: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

9/23/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/30/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (19STCV25932 AND 19STCV40154); ...)

4/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (19STCV25932 AND 19STCV40154); ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (19STCV25932 AND 19STCV40154); ...) OF 04/08/2020

4/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (19STCV25932 AND 19STCV40154); ...) OF 04/08/2020

Substitution of Attorney

2/3/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

1/8/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff); Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((Related Case 19STCV25932)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((Related Case 19STCV25932)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docketat 3:41 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (19STCV25932 and 19STCV40154); ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (19STCV25932 and 19STCV40154); ...) of 04/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Numark Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NUMARK TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SYSCO CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA SYSCO SAN ANTONIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRITZER ANNE C. ESQ.