This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 17:18:08 (UTC).

NUEVA ESPERANZA HEALTHCARE MEDICAL CLINIC, INC. VS COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 NUEVA ESPERANZA HEALTHCARE MEDICAL CLINIC, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9790

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NUEVA ESPERANZA HEALTHCARE MEDICAL CLINIC INC. A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION

NUEVA ESPERANZA HEALTHCARE MEDICAL CLINIC INC.

Defendants

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION

MITCHELL ACCIE M M.D.

BRANDT RONALD L

BRANDT RONALD L.

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC.

CFC MANAGEMENT LLC

I HEALTH INC.

ADVANCED HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELDESSOUKY MOHAMED

FICHTELMAN KEITH

Defendant Attorney

STEINBERG CRAIG S

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/3/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

12/18/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION

1/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021

1/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Compel Arbitration

1/21/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/20/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/20/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/21/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER

Request for Judicial Notice

4/21/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/21/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DR. AMANI ELDESSOUKY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DR. AMANI ELDESSOUKY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEITH FICHTELMAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEITH FICHTELMAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Ruling

4/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER)

4/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER)

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/27/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/03/2021, A COPY OF THE L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE AND M

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/03/2021, A COPY OF THE L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE AND M

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 11:29 AM in Department 16; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/03/2021, A copy of the L.A.S.C. minute order issued this date is attached to the Clerk's Certificate of Mailing/Notice and mailed to Plaintiff's counsel this date.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketReply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION); Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Entry of Protective Order) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nueva Esperanza Healthcare medical Clinic Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fichtelman, Keith H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELDESSOUKY MOHAMED