Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 13:39:07 (UTC).

NSHAN TER-OGANESYAN VS MICHAEL ALLEN DODD

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 NSHAN TER-OGANESYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL ALLEN DODD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8457

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TER-OGANESYAN NSHAN

Defendant

DODD MICHAEL ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARTOUNIAN AROUTIN

Defendant Attorney

BRISCOE J. JACKSON

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

1/19/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

1/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • Hearing06/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael Allen Dodd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nshan Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nshan Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nshan Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRISCOE J. JACKSON