This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 01:58:09 (UTC).

NSHAN KOTOUKIAN, ET AL. VS HASMIK JASMINE OHANIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 NSHAN KOTOUKIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HASMIK JASMINE OHANIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6069

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOTOUKIAN NSHAN

KOTUKYAN CHRISTINE

KOTUKYAN ANGELA

YETARYAN KARINE

Defendants

APPLE HOME DEVELOPER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OHANIAN HASMIK JASMINE

ASATRYAN ANDRANIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK

Defendant Attorneys

GAROFALO ANDREW

OHANIAN HASMIK JASMINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS

6/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/28/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer - DEFENDANT JASMINE OHANIAN'S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/10/2019: Answer - DEFENDANT JASMINE OHANIAN'S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer

8/5/2019: Answer

Answer

7/23/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/13/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/8/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/8/2019: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Law Firm Address); Filed by Andranik Asatryan (Defendant); Apple Home Developer, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDefendant Jasmine Ohanian's Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint; Filed by Hasmik Jasmine Ohanian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hasmik Jasmine Ohanian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Andranik Asatryan (Defendant); Apple Home Developer, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nshan Kotoukian (Plaintiff); Karine Yetaryan (Plaintiff); Angela Kotukyan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAROFALO ANDREW